Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Malvestiti

Bishop of Lodi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1953 Born
11 Jun 197723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
19 Jun 200955.8AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
26 Aug 201461.0AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
11 Oct 201461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
26 Oct 201461.1InstalledBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Malvestiti
Bishop Maurizio Malvestiti (born ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarne, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lodi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Aug 2014
  • i: CB, 5 Sep 2014
  • c34: CB, 12 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,307
  • loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020
  • usec: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast