Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Maldaner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1924Born
8 Dec 195026.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 196641.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
15 Apr 196641.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
29 Jun 196641.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
27 May 197146.8AppointedBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 200177.3RetiredBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Nov 200884.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bruno Maldaner (VIAF: 14231627)
Bishop Bruno Maldaner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Frederico Westphalen

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinhal Alto

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast