Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zeno Hastenteufel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1946Born
8 Jul 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 200155.4AppointedBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Mar 200255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Mar 200255.7InstalledBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Mar 200760.7AppointedBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 Jan 202275.5RetiredBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Apr 202578.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary
Zeno Hastenteufel
Bishop Zeno Hastenteufel
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinha Rodrigues da Rosa, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul
Death PlacePorto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,143
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2022
  • d: CB, 30 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025