Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kobina Louis

Auxiliary Bishop of Accra, Ghana

Titular Bishop of FesseŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1964 Born
18 Jul 199227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Accra, Ghana
14 Feb 202358.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Accra, Ghana
14 Feb 202358.2AppointedTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
19 Apr 202358.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of FesseŽ

MicroData Summary for John Kobina Louis
(WikiData: Q116786753)
Bishop John Kobina Louis (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Accra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccra, Diocese of Accra
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Adabraka, Archdiocese of Accra

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Accra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2023
  • ob: CB, 1 Mar 2023
  • c2: CB, 12 Mar 2023
  • c34: CB, 19 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024