Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Anani Kofi Lodonu

Bishop Emeritus of Ho, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1937 Born
18 May 196426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Keta, Ghana
17 May 197335.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Keta, Ghana
17 May 197335.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
29 Jun 197335.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mascula
10 Apr 197638.3AppointedBishop of Keta-Ho, Ghana
19 Dec 199457.0AppointedBishop of Ho, Ghana
14 Jul 201577.6RetiredBishop of Ho, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Francis Anani Kofi Lodonu
Bishop Francis Anani Kofi Lodonu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHohoe
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,189
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast