Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro Magbanua Lladoc

Deceased

Bishop of Bacolod, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1893Born
25 Mar 191825.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 193340.3AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
16 Sep 193340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
24 Oct 193340.6InstalledBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
22 Sep 195158.5DiedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Magbanua Lladoc
Bishop Casimiro Magbanua Lladoc (born , died ) Bishop of Bacolod

EventPlace
Birth PlacePilar, Sorsogon

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 60
  • mn: CB, 22 Jul 2015
  • i: CB, 18 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast