Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Marvin LeVoir

Bishop Emeritus of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1946 Born
30 May 198135.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
14 Jul 200862.4AppointedBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
15 Sep 200862.6Ordained BishopBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
6 Aug 202074.4ResignedBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Marvin LeVoir
Bishop John Marvin LeVoir (born ) Bishop Emeritus of New Ulm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinneapolis, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained BishopCivic Center, New Ulm, Diocese of New Ulm, Minnesota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of New Ulm.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,959
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast