Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leszek Leszkiewicz

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Bossa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1970 Born
25 May 199626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
19 Dec 201545.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
19 Dec 201545.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bossa
6 Feb 201645.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bossa

MicroData Summary for Leszek Leszkiewicz (VIAF: 3933147425857745040003)
Bishop Leszek Leszkiewicz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorlice
Ordained PriestNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Tarnów, Diocese of Tarnów
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Tarnów, Diocese of Tarnów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 5 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast