Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enemésio Ângelo Lazzaris, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1948Born
27 Oct 197425.8ProfessedMember of Sons of Divine Providence
26 Jul 197526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
12 Dec 200758.9AppointedBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
29 Mar 200859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
2 Feb 202071.1DiedBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Enemésio Ângelo Lazzaris
Bishop Enemésio Ângelo Lazzaris F.D.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Balsas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiderópolis
Ordained BishopSanto Antônio, Church, Balsas, Diocese of Balsas, Maranhão
Death PlaceDom Orione, Hospital, Araguaina

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,694
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast