Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Raymund Guidobald von Lamberg, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1662³Born
168724.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Sep 169129.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Sep 169129.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 May 170139.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
9 May 170139.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
8 Sep 170139.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
6 Apr 172562.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Raymund Guidobald von Lamberg
Bishop Johann Raymund Guidobald von Lamberg O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1701, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,488
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast