Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Damase Laberge, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru

Titular Bishop of Clypia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1900Born
11 Jul 192625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Jan 194645.2AppointedPrefect of San José de Amazonas, Peru
3 Jul 195554.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru
3 Jul 195554.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
8 Sep 195554.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clypia
25 Dec 196868.2DiedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Damase Laberge
Bishop José Damase Laberge O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteauguay, Canada

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast