Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Josef Kuhnle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sorres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1926Born
20 Jul 195226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
13 Oct 197650.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
13 Oct 197650.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sorres
27 Nov 197650.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sorres
7 Nov 199064.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
4 Feb 202194.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Josef Kuhnle
Bishop Franz Josef Kuhnle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavensburg
Ordained BishopS. Fidelis, Stuttgard, Diocese of Rottenburg
Death PlaceTettnang

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,440
  • d: CB, 5 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast