Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Moser

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1923Born
19 Mar 194824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Oct 197047.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Oct 197047.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiges
14 Nov 197047.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiges
12 Mar 197551.7AppointedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Apr 197551.8InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
9 May 198864.9DiedBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Moser
Bishop Georg Moser (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeutkirch
Ordained BishopS. Eberhard, Church, Stuttgart, Diocese of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 731

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast