Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Helmut Krätzl

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1931 Born
29 Jun 195422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 197745.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 197745.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
20 Nov 197746.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
6 Mar 200876.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Helmut Krätzl (VIAF: 47668992)
Bishop Helmut Krätzl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast