Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyryl Klimowicz

Bishop of San Giuseppe a Irkutsk, Russian Federation

Apostolic Administrator of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1952 Born
8 Jun 198027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
13 Oct 199946.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
13 Oct 199946.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
4 Dec 199947.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba
17 Apr 200350.4AppointedBishop of San Giuseppe a Irkutsk, Russian Federation
17 Apr 200350.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk, Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Cyryl Klimowicz
Bishop Cyryl Klimowicz (born ) Bishop of San Giuseppe a Irkutsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmangeldi, Kazakhstan
Ordained PriestOlsztyn
Ordained BishopSainte Marie, Cathedral, Minsk, Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Giuseppe a Irkutsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast