Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Kinney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1937Born
2 Feb 196325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
9 Nov 197639.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
9 Nov 197639.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caprulae
25 Jan 197739.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caprulae
28 Jun 198245.0AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
23 Aug 198245.1InstalledBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
9 May 199557.9AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
6 Jul 199558.0InstalledBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
20 Sep 201376.2RetiredBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
27 Sep 201982.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Kinney
Bishop John Francis Kinney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOelwein, IA
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Death PlaceSt. Augusta, MN
Buried Place (Original)Assumption, Cemetery, St. Cloud, Diocese of Saint Cloud, Minnesota

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2013
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015
  • d: CB, 27 Sep 2019
  • 23.loc: CB, 30 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,534

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast