Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Kim Woon-hoe (Un-hoe)

Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

Apostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1944 Born
8 Dec 197329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
12 Oct 200257.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
12 Oct 200257.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vadesi
21 Nov 200258.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vadesi
2010¹65.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hamhŭng, Korea (North)
28 Jan 201065.2AppointedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
25 Mar 201065.4InstalledBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
21 Nov 202076.0RetiredBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Kim Woon-hoe (Un-hoe)
Bishop Lucas Kim Woon-hoe (Un-hoe) (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul, Archdiocese of Seoul
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Seoul, Archdiocese of Seoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,282
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 7 Jan 2021

Quantcast