Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
30 Apr 1973 | Born | ||
9 Jul 2010 | 37.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Dodoma, Tanzania |
12 Feb 2024 | 50.7 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Dodoma, Tanzania |
12 Feb 2024 | 50.7 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Zallata |
Father
Wilbroad Henry
Kibozi
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of Dodoma
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Dodoma, Diocese of Dodoma |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Dodoma.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠