Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Kalata, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Semta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1925Born
31 Jul 194318.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
12 Aug 195126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Sep 195530.3Ordained BishopBishop
16 Mar 198559.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
24 Aug 201893.2DiedTitular Bishop of Semta

MicroData Summary for Dominik Kalata
Bishop Dominik Kalata S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Semta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowa Biala, Diocese of Kraków, Poland
Ordained Bishop(in secret), Czechoslovakia
Death PlaceIvanka pri Dunaji, Archdiocese of Bratislava, Slovakia

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 62.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 71
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,419
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,675
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,475
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast