Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kalacherry (Kalassery)

Deceased

Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1892Born
19 Apr 191926.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 192735.5AppointedBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
21 Dec 192735.6Ordained BishopBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
27 Oct 194957.5DiedBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for James Kalacherry (Kalassery)
Bishop James Kalacherry (Kalassery) (born , died ) Bishop of Changanacherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKainakary

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast