Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Jugis

Bishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1957 Born
12 Jun 198326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
1 Aug 200346.4AppointedBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
24 Oct 200346.6Ordained BishopBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Jugis
Bishop Peter Joseph Jugis (born ) Bishop of Charlotte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharlotte, Diocese of Charlotte, North Carolina
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Charlotte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast