Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Janssen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1932Born
2 Feb 196128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
4 Jul 198653.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
4 Jul 198653.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
21 Sep 198653.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
31 May 201077.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
27 May 202188.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Janssen
Bishop Heinrich Janssen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKevelaer
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster
Death PlaceKevelaer

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Number 8,553
  • d: CB, 28 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast