Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Pedro Juárez Meléndez

Bishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1951 Born
9 Aug 197524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tlaxcala, México
12 Oct 200655.2AppointedBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
26 Nov 200655.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Pedro Juárez Meléndez
Bishop Juan Pedro Juárez Meléndez (born ) Bishop of Tula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro Tlalcuapán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2006
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022