Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raymond Gerhardt Hunthausen

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1921Born
1 Jun 194624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Helena, Montana, USA
8 Jul 196240.8AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
30 Aug 196241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
13 Feb 197553.4AppointedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
21 Aug 199170.0RetiredArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
22 Jul 201896.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond Gerhardt Hunthausen (VIAF: 281610998)
Archbishop Raymond Gerhardt Hunthausen (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnaconda
Death PlaceHelena, Diocese of Helena, Montana

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 130
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast