Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alberto Huamán Camayo, O.M.I.

Auxiliary Bishop of Huancayo, Peru

Titular Bishop of Tepelta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1970 Born
7 Jan 200130.9Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Oct 200131.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 May 202151.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huancayo, Peru
21 May 202151.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
16 Jul 202151.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta

MicroData Summary for Luis Alberto Huamán Camayo
Bishop Luis Alberto Huamán Camayo O.M.I. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Huancayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarma, Territorial Prelature of Tarma
Ordained BishopLa Inmaculada, Church, Huancayo, Archdiocese of Huancayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Huancayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jun 2021
  • c34: CB, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast