Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lawson Howze

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1923Born
4 Dec 194825.2Converted
7 May 195935.6Ordained PriestPriest of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
8 Nov 197249.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Natchez-Jackson, Mississippi, USA
8 Nov 197249.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
28 Jan 197349.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
8 Mar 197753.5AppointedBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
6 Jun 197753.7InstalledBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
15 May 200177.7RetiredBishop of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA
9 Jan 201995.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Biloxi, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lawson Howze (VIAF: 4825154137642815370001)
Bishop Joseph Lawson Howze (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Biloxi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaphne, AL, Diocese of Mobile, Alabama
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Cathedral, Raleigh, Diocese of Raleigh, North Carolina
Ordained BishopMunicipal Auditorium, Jackson, Diocese of Natchez-Jackson, Mississippi
Death PlaceOcean Springs, Hospital, Ocean Springs, MS
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Prayer Garden, Nativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Biloxi, Diocese of Biloxi, Mississippi

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Jan 2019
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1973, Number 6
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,070

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast