Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Hombach, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1879Born
23 Feb 190727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
3 Feb 192343.2AppointedArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
10 May 192343.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
17 Oct 193353.9DiedArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Agustín Hombach
Archbishop Agustín Hombach C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tegucigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHänningen, Germany
Ordained BishopTegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,802

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast