Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinaldo Ernst Enrich (Heribert) Pünder

Deceased

Bishop of Coroatá, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1939Born
10 Oct 196425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
5 May 197839.3AppointedBishop of Coroatá, Maranhão, Brazil
29 Jul 197839.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coroatá, Maranhão, Brazil
16 Jan 201172.0DiedBishop of Coroatá, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Reinaldo Ernst Enrich (Heribert) Pünder (VIAF: 280953569)
Bishop Reinaldo Ernst Enrich (Heribert) Pünder (born , died ) Bishop of Coroatá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlin, Germany
Ordained BishopPalmares, Diocese of Palmares, Pernambuco

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast