Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Hubert Goumans, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bandung, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Lauzadus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1883Born
22 Dec 190623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
27 May 193248.6AppointedPrefect of Bandung, Indonesia
16 Oct 194158.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lauzadus
16 Oct 194158.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bandung, Indonesia
22 Apr 194258.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lauzadus
3 Mar 195167.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bandung, Indonesia
6 Oct 195370.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bandung, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Jacques Hubert Goumans
Bishop Jacques Hubert Goumans O.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bandung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenray
Ordained BishopBandung, Vicariate Apostolic of Bandung

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,055

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast