Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anacleto Cordeiro Gonçalves de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1946Born
15 Aug 197024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
4 Feb 200558.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
4 Feb 200558.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
24 Apr 200558.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
11 Jun 201063.9AppointedBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal
15 Aug 201064.0InstalledBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal
18 Sep 202074.1DiedBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Anacleto Cordeiro Gonçalves de Oliveira (VIAF: 99944133)
Bishop Anacleto Cordeiro Gonçalves de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop of Viana do Castelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortes
Ordained BishopFátima, Diocese of Leiria-Fátima
Death Placenear Almodôvar

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,877
  • d: CB, 18 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast