Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Miguel Gómez Rodríguez

Archbishop of Manizales, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1961 Born
2 Feb 198725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
22 Nov 200443.5AppointedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
5 Feb 200543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
12 Feb 200543.8InstalledBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
23 Feb 201553.8AppointedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
25 Apr 202160.0AppointedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
5 Jun 202160.1InstalledArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Gómez Rodríguez
Archbishop José Miguel Gómez Rodríguez (born ) Archbishop of Manizales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosario, Cathedral Basilica, Manizales, Archdiocese of Manizales

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Manizales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,820
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2015
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast