Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mikel Garciandía Goņi

Bishop-Elect of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1964 Born
25 Jun 199531.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
31 Oct 202359.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
20 Jan 202459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mikel Garciandía Goņi
Father Mikel Garciandía Goņi (born ) Bishop-Elect of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtxarri Aranatz, Navarra, Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Ordained BishopPalencia, Diocese of Palencia

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Palencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2023
  • ob: CB, 31 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 4 Nov 2023