Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Gallardo García, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1927Born
8 Apr 195022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
11 Jul 197446.7AppointedBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
24 Sep 197446.9Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
21 May 198759.5AppointedBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
27 Dec 200376.1RetiredBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
30 Jan 202193.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Gallardo García
Bishop Rafael Gallardo García O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tampico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYuriria
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Philip, Church, Linares, Diocese of Linares, Nuevo León
Death PlaceTampico, Diocese of Tampico, Tamaulipas
Buried Place (Original)Tampico, Diocese of Tampico, Tamaulipas

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,703

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast