Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Galindo Mendoza, M.Sp.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1894Born
7 Aug 192126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
9 Dec 194854.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of California Inferiore, México
9 Dec 194854.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lipara
22 Jan 194954.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lipara
4 Sep 196369.0AppointedBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
21 Mar 197075.5RetiredBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
21 Mar 197075.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
9 Jan 197681.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Burca
23 Oct 198490.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Galindo Mendoza
Bishop Alfredo Galindo Mendoza M.Sp.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tijuana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Guzmán
Ordained BishopTemplo Expiatorio Nacional de San Felipe de Jesús, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast