Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Roméo Gagnon

Deceased

Bishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1903Born
8 Jul 192825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
12 Feb 194945.9AppointedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
31 Mar 194946.1Ordained BishopBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
18 Feb 197066.9DiedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Roméo Gagnon
Bishop Joseph-Roméo Gagnon (born , died ) Bishop of Edmundston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Cyrille-de-Wendover

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 24
  • c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast