Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Ferraioli

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Volturnum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1929Born
8 Dec 195424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 May 197646.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volturnum
14 Jun 197646.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ghana
27 Jun 197646.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Volturnum
25 Aug 197949.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Benin
25 Aug 197949.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Togo
21 Jul 198151.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
21 Jul 198151.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Seychelles
198252.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
199464.0ResignedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
31 Jan 200070.1DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ferraioli (VIAF: 89038095)
Archbishop Giuseppe Ferraioli (born , died ) Official Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,203
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast