Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Achille Eyabi

Bishop of Eséka, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1961 Born
30 Jul 198826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
22 Mar 199331.4IncardinatedPriest of Edéa, Cameroon
14 Nov 202059.1AppointedBishop of Eséka, Cameroon
8 Jan 202159.2Ordained BishopBishop of Eséka, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for François Achille Eyabi
Bishop François Achille Eyabi (born ) Bishop of Eséka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNgambe, Diocese of Douala
Ordained BishopEséka, Diocese of Eséka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eséka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Dec 2020
  • c34: CB, 8 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 8 Jan 2021

Quantcast