Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Emanuelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1863Born
16 Oct 188724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ventimiglia, Italy
29 Aug 191046.8AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
22 Jan 191147.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
10 Oct 194784.0DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Emanuelli
Bishop Francesco Emanuelli (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndagna, Diocese of Ventimiglia
Ordained BishopSanta Anna, Church, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 6
  • loc: CB, 20 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast