Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Jan Dziuba, O.S.P.P.E.

Bishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1960 Born
25 Aug 198020.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
21 Sep 198525.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
14 Dec 198525.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
31 May 198626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
31 Dec 200848.6AppointedBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa
14 Mar 200948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Umzimkulu, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Jan Dziuba
Bishop Stanisław Jan Dziuba O.S.P.P.E. (born ) Bishop of Umzimkulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadomsko, Diocese of Częstochowa, Poland
Ordained DeaconAssumption of Mary, Basilica, Częstochowa - Jasna Góra, Diocese of Częstochowa, Poland
Ordained PriestAssumption of Mary, Basilica, Częstochowa - Jasna Góra, Diocese of Częstochowa, Poland
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Teachers College, Umzimkulu, Diocese of Umzimkulu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umzimkulu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast