Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Tarife Durero, S.V.D.

Bishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1968 Born
1991²22.7First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
25 May 199527.1Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
12 Dec 199527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
23 May 202153.1AppointedBishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea
29 Aug 202153.3Ordained BishopBishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Tarife Durero
Bishop Joseph Tarife Durero S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Daru-Kiunga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDapa
Ordained PriestDivine Word, Seminary, Tagaytay
Ordained BishopSt. Gerard, Cathedral, Kiunga, Diocese of Daru-Kiunga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daru-Kiunga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Aug 2021

Quantcast