Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Wilson Douglas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1901Born
1 May 192422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Feb 194846.4AppointedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Apr 194846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Feb 195452.4ResignedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Feb 195452.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
12 Jun 196765.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edward Wilson Douglas
Bishop Edward Wilson Douglas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrosshill, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Good Aid, Cathedral, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Death PlaceSouthern General, Hospital, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick, Cemetery, New Stevenson, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 34
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast