Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos dos Santos, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Ausuccura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1951Born
11 Feb 197321.7First VowsMember of Sons of Divine Providence
22 Dec 197827.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sons of Divine Providence
16 Dec 197928.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
20 Jun 200150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil
20 Jun 200150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
29 Sep 200150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
25 Mar 200250.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Luziânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos dos Santos
Bishop José Carlos dos Santos F.D.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Luziânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaruim
Ordained DeaconReggio Calabria
Ordained PriestTres Lagoâs
Ordained Bishoppalazzo dello sport, Luziânia, Diocese of Luziânia, Goias
Death PlaceBrasilia

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,056
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast