Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Dione

Deceased

Bishop of Thiès, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1919Born
18 Apr 194929.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dakar, Senegal
6 Feb 196949.6AppointedBishop of Thiès, Senegal
15 May 196949.9Ordained BishopBishop of Thiès, Senegal
4 Feb 198565.6DiedBishop of Thiès, Senegal

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Dione
Bishop François-Xavier Dione (born Jun 1919, died ) Bishop of Thiès

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiapong
Ordained PriestCathedral, Dakar, Vicariate Apostolic of Dakar
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne, Church, Thiès, Diocese of Thiès

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 64
  • c1: CB, 10 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Sep 2021

Quantcast