Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Custodio Angel Díaz Merino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1740Born
26 Aug 180665.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
29 Jun 180968.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
12 Jan 181574.3DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Custodio Angel Díaz Merino
Bishop Custodio Angel Díaz Merino O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIniesta, Spain

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 128, Number 685

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast