Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Gabriel Diarra

Deceased

Bishop of San, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1945Born
30 Dec 197227.4Ordained PriestPriest of San, Mali
18 Nov 198742.3AppointedBishop of San, Mali
20 Nov 198843.3Ordained BishopBishop of San, Mali
28 Oct 201974.2DiedBishop of San, Mali

MicroData Summary for Jean-Gabriel Diarra
Bishop Jean-Gabriel Diarra (born , died ) Bishop of San

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVanekui
Ordained BishopBamako, Archdiocese of Bamako
Death PlaceBamako, Archdiocese of Bamako

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,922
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 28 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast