Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giampio Luigi Devasini

Bishop-Elect of Chiavari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1962 Born
8 Jun 200239.7Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
10 Apr 202158.5AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
29 May 202158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiavari, Italy
20 Jun 202158.7InstalledBishop of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giampio Luigi Devasini
Father Giampio Luigi Devasini (born ) Bishop-Elect of Chiavari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia)
Ordained BishopSant’Evasio, Cathedral, Casale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Chiavari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2021
  • ob: CB, 10 Apr 2021
  • c1: AM, 12 Apr 2021
  • i: AM, 27 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 May 2021

Quantcast