Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ðặng Ðức Ngân

Bishop of Ðà Nẵng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1957 Born
8 Dec 198730.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
12 Oct 200750.3AppointedBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
3 Dec 200750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
12 Mar 201658.7AppointedBishop of Ðà Nẵng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ðặng Ðức Ngân
Bishop Joseph Ðặng Ðức Ngân (born ) Bishop of Ðà Nẵng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHà Nôi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ðà Nẵng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,573
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast