Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Daoud (David)

Deceased

Bishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1870Born
4 Jun 189322.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 191039.2SelectedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Feb 191039.3ConfirmedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Aug 191039.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
1 Oct 193968.9DiedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for François Daoud (David)
Bishop François Daoud (David) (born , died ) Bishop of Amadiyah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraden
Ordained PriestMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)
Ordained BishopMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 49
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Mar 2021

Quantcast