Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Romeu Dantas Bastos

Bishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1955 Born
18 May 198529.7Ordained PriestPriest of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
24 Apr 200246.6AppointedBishop of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil
27 Jul 200246.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil
13 Jan 202165.3AppointedBishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil
19 Mar 202165.5InstalledBishop of Jequié, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Romeu Dantas Bastos
Bishop Paulo Romeu Dantas Bastos (born ) Bishop of Jequié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuova-Soure, Diocese of Alagoinhas, Bahia
Ordained BishopSão João Batista, Cathedral, Barreiras, Diocese of Barreiras, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jequié.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,233
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2021
  • i: AM, 23 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast