Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni D’Alise

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1948Born
23 Sep 197224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Acerra, Italy
5 Jun 200456.3AppointedBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
17 Jul 200456.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
12 Sep 200456.6InstalledBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
21 Mar 201466.1AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
18 May 201466.3InstalledBishop of Caserta, Italy
4 Oct 202072.7DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni D’Alise
Bishop Giovanni D’Alise (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopMaria SS Assunta, Cathedral, Acerra, Diocese of Acerra
Death PlaceHospital, Caserta, Diocese of Caserta

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,656
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2004
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 4 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast